(Close Window)
Topic: Fast maths truly amazing<<
Message: Posted by: wulfiesmith (Mar 21, 2009 07:33AM)
For me this was new.
I have NEVER been interested in maths. It's just NOT my subject at all.
Yet when I found Fast Maths on YouTube, I was transformed.
My wife would just NOT believe it....she would fire a maths question at me ... and within seconds I had the answer. This is just NOT me. She did not know how I came up with the answer sooooo quickly. It's such fun. A great intertainer...

18 x15 =
93 x 97 =
143539 x 11 =
73 x 57 =
????? easy.

good "after dinner" entertainment
Message: Posted by: Angelo the Magician (May 4, 2009 07:26AM)
18 x 15 = 9 x 30 = 270

93 x 97 = (95 - 2) x (95 + 2) = 95 - 2 = 9025 (see the trick on another thread)- 4 = 9021

143539 x 11 = 1435390 + 143539 = 1578929 (adding starts from the last digit)

73 x 57 = (65 + 8) x (65 - 8) = 65 - 64 = 4225 - 64 = 4161


Not from you-tube (as I am sitting here without possibility to see it), but easy caluclations.

Angelo